THE ECOTECH CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 28 October 1998: Standard registration
- 15 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ECOTECH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH APRIL 1998, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 1ST OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY ARE ESTABLISHED ARE TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL AND ECOLOGICAL MATTERS BY THE PROVISION OF AN EDUCATIONAL CENTRE IN SWAFFHAM AND IN PARTICULAR: (A) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (WHICH TERM SHALL INCLUDE INDIVIDUALS, COMMERCIAL CONCERNS, PUBLIC BODIES AND EVERY OTHER TYPE OF ENTITY OR ORGANISATION) A CENTRE IN SWAFFHAM TO BE KNOWN AS THE ECOTECH CENTRE TO ADVANCE FOSTER AND INCREASE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF AND INTEREST IN ENVIRONMENTAL AND ECOLOGICAL ISSUES, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE PRODUCTION OF ENERGY FROM RENEWABLE SOURCES AND ENVIRONMENTALLY SUSTAINABLE APPROACHES TO ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND TO PROVIDE: (1) RESEARCH FACILITIES; (11) EDUCATIONAL AND INFORMATION RESOURCES, FACILITIES AND DISPLAYS; AND (111) CONFERENCE AND TRAINING FACILITIES AND ATTRACTIONS AND EVENTS IN EACH CASE CONNECTED WITH ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES AND A PUBLIC FORUM OR MEETING PLACE FOR THOSE VISITING OR MAKING USE OF THE CENTRE TOGETHER WITH ANCILLARY RECREATIONAL AND REFRESHMENT FACILITIES. (B) TO MAINTAIN MANAGE AND PROMOTE THE CENTRE AND ITS OBJECTIVES AND FACILITIES WHETHER ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHERS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY; (C) TO PROMOTE SUPPORT ENCOURAGE AND FACILITATE PROJECTS AND DEVELOPMENTS WHICH WILL PRODUCE BENEFITS FOR THE COMMUNITY THROUGH THE THEIR APPROACH TO ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES; AND (D) TO PROMOTE SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE AND FACILITATE THE USE OF MORE SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES THROUGH RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, EDUCATION AND THE COLLECTION AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION ABOUT WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES GENERALLY;
Area of benefit
SWAFFHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window