Accounts and annual returns PONTELAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1067267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2024 14 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2023 09 July 2024 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 Not Required