WIRRAL ENVIRONMENTAL NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charitys objects are to advance the education of the public about the preservation of our world's natural environment, ecological sustainability, natural resource conservation, waste minimisation, recycling and the principles of fair trade, within Wirral and surrounding area.'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £18,582 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wirral
Governance
- 25 February 1998: Standard registration
- WIRRAL ENVIRONMENTAL NETWORK (Previous name)
- WIRRAL GREEN ALLIANCE (Previous name)
- WIRRAL LA21 NETWORK (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Elizabeth Shields | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patricia Litherland | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Mark Shoebridge | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
David George Jones | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Charles Griffiths | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Martin Brown | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.31k | £61.45k | £75.24k | £50.01k | £45.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.69k | £47.62k | £58.36k | £47.25k | £49.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £33.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.58k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 21ST AUGUST 2003 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ENVIRONMENT AND ABOUT THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WIRRAL ENVIRONMENT CENTRE
SANDON BUILDINGS
100 FALKLAND ROAD
WALLASEY
CH44 8ER
- Phone:
- 01516392121
- Email:
- wen@la21.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window