NORTHWICH, DANE VALLEY CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1066793
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ARRANGING MEETINGS FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP, WHICH INCLUDES BIBLE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN CHRISTIAN LIVING. PREACHING THE CHRISTIAN MESSAGE TO THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE CONGREGATION AREA. DISTRIBUTING BIBLES AND OTHER RELIGIOUS LITERATURE. ALL OF THESE SERVICES AND FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED WITHOUT CHARGE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £22,476
Total expenditure: £11,848

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 1997: Standard registration
  • 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.38k £8.87k £10.86k £11.29k £22.48k
Total expenditure £7.77k £7.27k £11.17k £9.74k £11.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required