National Centre For Universities and Business

Charity number: 1066956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Higher and Post Graduate Research

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CIHE (Working name)
  • THE COUNCIL FOR INDUSTRY AND HIGHER EDUCATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sam Laidlaw Chair 01 June 2015
None on record
Sir John Manzoni KCB Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Professor Trevor JOhn McMillan Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Sir Jonathan Richard Symonds Trustee 08 December 2022
THE JINJA EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE KEEPERS AND GOVERNORS OF THE POSSESSIONS, REVENUES AND GOODS OF THE FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OF JOHN LYON, WITHIN THE TOWN OF HARROW-ON-THE-HILL
Received: On time
Professor Judith Irene Petts Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Professor Ian Hugh White Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Adele Leana Every Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Robert Rabone Trustee 09 September 2019
None on record
Professor Jean-Noel Ezingeard Trustee 20 June 2019
The Cathedrals Group of Universities
Received: On time
LONDON HIGHER
Received: On time
Professor David Roy Sandbach Trustee 20 June 2019
THE REECE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
David Watson McNair Brown Trustee 20 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.57m £2.59m £3.14m £2.67m £3.03m
Total expenditure £2.21m £2.79m £2.79m £2.75m £3.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.94m £2.21m £2.70m £2.24m £2.61m
Income - Donations and legacies £614.00k £372.00k £442.00k £415.00k £405.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.95m £2.21m £2.70m £2.24m £2.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £272 £73 £26 £1.54k £13.75k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £10.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.08m £2.65m £2.71m £2.66m £2.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £125.93k £144.14k £77.86k £92.46k £109.13k
Expenditure - Governance £8.70k £8.66k £10.60k £10.98k £11.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £8.98k £15.49k £17.81k £29.88k £26.59k
Long-term investments £0 £35 £35 £35 £0
Other assets £1.17m £867.46k £1.35m £1.17m £1.07m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £174.30k £84.42k £212.59k £134.17k £82.18k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DC.115 The Clarence Centre
6 St Georges Circus
London
SE1 6FE
Phone:
02073837667