THE SWWJ CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 July 1998: Standard registration
- 17 July 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | 30/06/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £780 | £1.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.38k | £2.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 12 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 25 February 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED ON THE 23 MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OTHER ASSISTANCE ( BY WAY OF GRANTS, SCHOLARSHIPS , PRIZES, BURSARIES OR OTHERWISE) TO WOMEN WRITERS AND WOMEN STUDYING TO BECOME WRITERS AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window