ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1066816
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bible teaching and instuction

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £13,892
Total expenditure: £12,019

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 December 1997: Standard registration
  • 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.55k £14.00k £13.69k £15.16k £13.89k
Total expenditure £16.02k £5.44k £4.67k £13.20k £12.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required