Accounts and annual returns THE CAPTAIN JAMES COOK, R.N. (CHARITY TRUST) WHITBY LTD
Charity number: 1069015
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2009 | 26 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 October 2008 | 18 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2008 | 02 April 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 October 2007 | 09 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2007 | 14 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 October 2006 | 07 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2006 | 03 December 2007 | 120 days late | |
Annual return | 05 October 2005 | 09 August 2006 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2005 | 09 August 2006 | 4 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window