CONGLETON AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of young members of the public at large, in agriculture, homecrafts,country life and related subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 12 February 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Billington | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW VENABLES | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT SIMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER HUDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TONY PACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JESSE BOSTOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.57k | £736 | £27.06k | £14.39k | £20.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.09k | £673 | £19.20k | £14.49k | £15.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 20 JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oaklands
North Rode
CONGLETON
Cheshire
CW12 2PH
- Phone:
- 07471500319
- Email:
- sarah_nixon@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window