Latin Iberian Missions Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Brazil
- Portugal
Governance
- 03 April 1998: Standard registration
- LATIN AMERICA MISSIONS TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ron Talbot | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Talbot | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jane Ford | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANGUS ROBIN CLEAVER | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MCILROY MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW PHILIP HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROL WYATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.93k | £53.82k | £31.87k | £17.55k | £29.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.52k | £55.53k | £28.74k | £26.85k | £23.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1998. as amended on 23 Nov 2019 as amended on 23 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR TRAINING PLACEMENT LIVING EXPENSES AND WORKING EXPENSES OF CHRISTIAN MISSIONARIES WORKING IN LATIN AMERICA, PORTUGAL AND SPAIN AMONGST THOSE WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR SICKNESS BOTH PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL OR WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Lynmouth Road
Perivale
GREENFORD
UB6 7HP
- Phone:
- 02085371923
- Email:
- heatherfordlamt@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window