AFAR CULTURE AND EDUCATION (ACE)

Charity number: 1071003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

general charitable work, make grant to organisation and provide human resources. currently the organisation dorment

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £91
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Djibouti
  • Eritrea
  • Ethiopia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 August 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MOHAMMED DAWA GARHISSA Trustee
None on record
MOHAMED BALUA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £91 £91 £0 £0 £91
Total expenditure £0 £91 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 August 2024 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 176
Applegarth House
Nelson Square
London
SE1 0PZ
Phone:
02076330993
Website:

No information available