Financial history HAVERFORDWEST TOWN MUSEUM

Charity number: 1072596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.17k £39.03k £4.43k £24.01k £24.01k
Total expenditure £13.79k £9.27k £13.05k £32.23k £32.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants £4.33k £28.74k N/A £23.69k £21.36k