HAVERFORDWEST TOWN MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EXHIBITIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £21,356 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 25 November 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Evans | Chair | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Peter Lewis | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||
John Mitchell | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Barrie Webb | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ROYDEN THOMAS | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Sally Williams | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CORRINE CODD | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES WILLIAM DOUGLAS DAVIES | Trustee | 12 June 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.17k | £39.03k | £4.43k | £24.01k | £24.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.79k | £9.27k | £13.05k | £32.23k | £32.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.33k | £28.74k | N/A | £23.69k | £21.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
2.1 TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AND RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF THE MUSEUM COMPRISING THE EXISTING COLLECTION TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER OBJECTS SPECIMENS OR COLLECTIONS AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS A COLLECTION ("THE COLLECTION") 2.2 TO FORM ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT AND TO AID IN THE FORMATION ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE COMPANIES INSTITUTIONS ASSOCIATIONS TRUSTS OR SOCIETIES FORMED FOR OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THE OBJECTS SET OUT ABOVE
Area of benefit
HAVERFORDWEST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haverfordwest Town Museum
Castle House
Castle Street
Haverfordwest
SA61 2EF
- Phone:
- 01437763087
- Email:
- simon615@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window