Trustees HAVERFORDWEST TOWN MUSEUM
Charity Number: 1072596

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Evans | Chair | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Peter Lewis | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||
John Mitchell | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Barrie Webb | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ROYDEN THOMAS | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Sally Williams | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CORRINE CODD | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES WILLIAM DOUGLAS DAVIES | Trustee | 12 June 1996 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.