THE WESTERN CH'AN FELLOWSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the Western Chan Fellowship are the provision of intensive residential meditation retreats and the coordination of local meditation groups across the UK with some contacts also in Europe. We also publish journals with a diverse range of articles on Buddhism and meditation practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 1998: Standard registration
- 12 June 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 June 2018: Funds transferred to 1166162 WESTERN CHAN FELLOWSHIP CIO
- WCF (Working name)
- WESTERN CHAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.08k | £72.51k | £88.26k | £90.71k | £60.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.78k | £63.97k | £71.64k | £81.48k | £48.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 24 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 24 April 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 16 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 16 July 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 08 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 08 August 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 19 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 19 April 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/11/1997 AS AMENDED ON 21/02/1998 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES OF BUDDHISM BY PROVIDING TRAINING IN BUDDHIST MEDITATION, BUDDHIST PHILOSOPHICAL INSIGHT AND BUDDHIST PRECEPTS BY MEANS OF THE TEACHING, PRACTICE AND TRANSMISSION OF THE CHINESE LINJI AND CAODONG TRADITIONS OF CHAN, AS TRANSMITTED THROUGH MASTER SHENG YEN. AND AS A SUPPLEMENT TO SUCH TRAINING: I) TO PROVIDE TRAINING IN BUDDHIST MEDITATION AS DEVELOPED IN TIBET AND ELSEWHERE AND II) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE INVESTIGATION AND STUDY OF BUDDHIST THEORY PSYCHOLOGY AND PRACTICE, AND ITS RELATION TO CONTEMPORARY WESTERN THOUGHT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window