THE PORT SUNLIGHT VILLAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust's principal objective is the conservation and maintenance of the fabric of Port Sunlight Village, its landscape, monuments and items of architectural significance or beauty and the preservation of its essential character. By means of a museum, the Trust also seeks to promote the ideas underlying the village's foundation and their relevance in the modern world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,159,686
Donations and legacies | £64.98k | |
Charitable activities | £2.76m | |
Other trading activities | £206.32k | |
Investments | £124.20k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,093,698
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.09m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.09m | |
Retained for future use | £65.99k |
People

53 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 17 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Bowden | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Croft | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Parnell | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Jane Dalton | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Mair Thomas | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Rachel Victoria McArdle | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Stephen Connolly | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.52m | £3.73m | £3.66m | £3.70m | £3.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.60m | £2.32m | £2.57m | £2.36m | £3.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £114.11k | £56.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £722.22k | £1.08m | £831.96k | £823.47k | £64.98k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £296.45k | £14.33k | £127.16k | £163.40k | £206.32k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.40m | £2.49m | £2.56m | £2.66m | £2.76m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.98k | £2.01k | £485 | £25.59k | £124.20k | |
|
Income - Other | £99.04k | £140.43k | £139.11k | £24.69k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £714.23k | £723.23k | £723.27k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.60m | £2.32m | £2.57m | £2.36m | £3.09m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £198.06k | £181.68k | £155.47k | £111.40k | £168.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £3.76k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £34.68m | £35.41m | £35.77m | £37.31m | £41.25m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £3.33m | £5.15m | £5.45m | £5.88m | £6.36m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£259.00k | -£150.00k | £508.00k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.25m | £1.80m | £1.16m | £381.10k | £453.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 FEBRUARY 1999 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 MAY 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN THE PORT SUNLIGHT CONSERVATION AREA IN MERSEYSIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION AT LARGE, THE PRESENT CHARACTER AND AMENITIES OF THAT AREA AND WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN THE PORT SUNLIGHT CONSERVATION AREA WHETHER IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS, OPEN SPACES OR OTHERWISE WHICH ARE OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING OF THE IDEAS UNDERLYING THE FOUNDATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE PORT SUNLIGHT CONSERVATION AREA AND SIMILAR FOUNDATIONS, THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONTEXT, AND THEIR RELEVANCE TO ISSUES IN THE MODERN WORLD
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 KING GEORGES DRIVE
WIRRAL
CH62 5DX
- Phone:
- 01516444800
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window