ASGBI CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medical Charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 February 1998: Standard registration
- 18 January 2024: Funds received from 1075960 SCARBOROUGH GASTROENTEROLOGY RESEARCH FUND
- ASGBI (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF SURGEONS OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND (Previous name)
- THE SURGICAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Moorehead | Chair | 26 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Alfred Adiamah | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Siong Seng Liau | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thanjakumar Arulampalam | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Rowan Wesley Park | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gazalla Safdar | Trustee | 21 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Neil Thomas Welch | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.08k | £11.15k | £13.06k | £4.78k | £2.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72k | £2.85k | £6.29k | £3.29k | £7.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 July 2024 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 APR 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE SURGICAL STANDARDS, AND IMPROVE OUTCOMES FOR PATIENTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING LEARNING, EDUCATION AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR TRAINEE AND QUALIFIED SURGEONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF SURGEONS OF
ENGLAND
38-43 LINCOLN'S INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3PE
- Phone:
- 02073044770
- Email:
- admin@asgbi.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window