LONDON DORCHESTER COMMITTEE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General education regarding the history of the Shire Hall in dorchester, in particular its connection with the Tolpuddle Martyrs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £11,760 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 August 1998: Standard registration
- 26 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.54k | £18.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £20.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 10 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 01 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF DORCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE ACQUISITION AND REFURBISHMENT OF THE SHIRE HALL, DORCHESTER FOR THE PROVISION OF A VISITOR CENTRE, AND BY ASSISTING IN THE REFURBISHMENT OF AN EDUCATIONAL EXHIBITION AT THE TOLPUDDLE MARTYRS MEMORIAL COTTAGES
Area of benefit
DORCHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window