Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SILVERSTONE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1072339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 02 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 02 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 13 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required