Financial history POPPINS NURSERY

Charity Number: 1067049
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £155.85k £148.02k £146.92k £182.76k £183.95k
Total expenditure £167.41k £161.26k £134.69k £176.91k £198.09k
Income from government contracts £125.98k £114.12k £113.42k £142.49k £148.89k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £21.89k £2.76k N/A