THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF CHRIST CHURCH BROADHEATH WORCESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for the support of the Parish Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 24 March 1998: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF BROADHEATH CHURCH (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joy Williams | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hodgetts | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET IRENE SEALEY | Trustee | 28 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.29k | £1.54k | £2.00k | £3.41k | £2.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £452 | £2.03k | £1.47k | £1.09k | £5.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 28 NOVEMBER 1997. AS AMENDED ON 17 FEBRUARY 1998, AND 21 MAY 1999.
Charitable objects
TO BEAUTIFY AND ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF CHRIST CHURCH, BROADHEATH IN THE DIOCESE OF WORCESTER AND OF THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND OF THE CHURCH YARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH AND TO PROTECT IT AS A PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
BROADHEATH IN DIOCESE OF WORCESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 RECTORY CLOSE
LOWER BROADHEATH
WORCESTER
WR2 6RD
- Phone:
- 01905640005
- Email:
- misealey084@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window