Financial history THE POETRY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1069314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £583.71k £577.18k £509.69k £562.98k £575.44k
Total expenditure £597.43k £420.38k £574.96k £509.65k £567.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £140.41k £212.46k £142.93k £142.99k £165.49k
Income - Donations and legacies £264.38k £281.31k £168.83k £168.56k £178.76k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £319.32k £295.84k £340.83k £393.94k £395.79k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12 £35 £28 £474 £890
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £596.11k £420.36k £573.98k £508.92k £567.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.32k £17 £973 £728 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £1.95k £3.83k £4.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0