CSKX STUDIOS

Charity number: 1067478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public by the promotion of the arts, including: Working together with artists and organisations to provide arts based workshops, educational activities and organising exhibitions and events, engaged predominantly within Camden, London. Working with and across generations, communities and sites of education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £810
Total expenditure: £2,962

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anna Winstanley Trustee 30 December 2021
None on record
Tania Inowlocki Trustee 09 February 2020
None on record
CRAIG SHEPPARD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.65k £5.33k £7.52k £5.79k £810
Total expenditure £11.00k £6.09k £1.38k £8.62k £2.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.21k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
223b Brecknock Road
LONDON
N19 5AA
Phone:
07903005280