EDUCATION SCHEME OF THE SRI LANKA WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants to secondary school girls between ages 12-16 and career grants to girls of 18-30. Providing funds for teaching of written and spoken English to women between 18-30 who live in Sri Lanka.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 29 May 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruvenie de Alwis Jayasinghe | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie LAYMAN | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|||||
THANGARANEE THURAISINGHAM | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
INDIRA WMALASENA | Trustee | 29 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MONA SWARIS | Trustee | 10 June 2012 |
|
|||||
MRS CHITRA JAYASOORIYA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £704 | £3.96k | £2.03k | £3.58k | £4.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.15k | £2.30k | £2.64k | £3.22k | £3.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED 18TH MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED 26 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
I) THE ADVANCEMENT OFTHE EDUCATION OF DESERVING GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN IN SRI LANKA BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO PUPILS AT SECONDARY SCHOOLS, THOSE ATTENDING VOCATIONAL COURSES AND, THOSE IN FURTHER EDUCATION AND/OR II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SRI LANKA BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT TO SCHOOLS AND EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND/OR III) TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR TEACHING OF WRITTEN AND SPOKEN ENGLISH.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA
Contact information
- Address:
-
264 HALFWAY STREET
SIDCUP
DA15 8DT
- Phone:
- 02088504049
- Email:
- antonchitraj@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window