INSTITUTE FOR EAST WEST STRATEGIC STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY WAS CREATED IN 1997 AND OPERATES UNDER THE SHORTER NAME OF RIESS. IT HOLDS PERIODIC SEMINARS AT APETHORPE PALACE (PE85DJ) ON EAST WEST STRATEGIC RELATIONS AND HAS STRONG ASSOCIATION WITH OXFORD UNIVERSITY AND CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Throughout London
- Australia
- Canada
- China
- France
- Italy
Governance
- 03 March 1998: Standard registration
- Research Institute for East West Strategic Studies (Working name)
- EOS HUMANITARIAN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Jean Christophe Iseux Von Pfetten | Chair | 17 October 1997 |
|
|
||||
Hon. Michelle Aliot Marie | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL LAIKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HRH PRINCE JOACHIM MURAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OWEN MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £1.00k | £3.00k | £3.00k | £9.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £1.00k | £3.00k | £3.00k | £9.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17/10/1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/12/2015
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE CHILDREN BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER LOCAL AUTHORITIES, LOCAL AGENCIES, CARERS AND FAMILIES IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN. 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE EFFECT OF WAR, FAMINE, OR ANY OTHER NATURAL OR MAN MADE DISASTER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apethorpe Palace
Hunting Way
Apethorpe
Peterborough
PE8 5DJ
- Phone:
- 0178479179
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window