Financial history NEW LIFE (IN CHRIST) MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1082101
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.26k £10.28k £11.07k £17.75k £13.50k
Total expenditure £16.72k £7.52k £8.52k £18.91k £15.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A