INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS TRAVEL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides travel scholarship to successful applicants from member schools of the Girls' Schools Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 January 1998: Standard registration
- 04 April 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- I S T A (Working name)
- INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.11k | £3.45k | £659 | £2.17k | £2.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.75k | £3.89k | £429 | £2.81k | £2.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 27 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 12 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | 16 March 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 5 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY MEANS OF ORGANISING AND PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL CRUISES AND AWARDING EDUCATIONAL SCHOLARSHIPS FOR CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOLS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHICH ARE MEMBERS OF THE GIRLS' SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE. IN THIS CONNECTION "EDUCATIONAL CRUISES" SHALL MEAN CRUISES ON WHICH THE PARTICIPANTS TAKE PART IN ACTIVITIES OF GENERAL EDUCATIONAL VAUE ON BOARD SHIP.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window