EDWARD'S TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Edward's Trust supports children and families who are facing loss and surviving bereavement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£638,488
Donations and legacies | £632.17k | |
Charitable activities | £840 | |
Other trading activities | £143 | |
Investments | £5.34k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£671,108
Raising funds | £100.82k | |
Charitable activities | £570.29k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £28,886 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £100.82k | |
Charitable expenditure | £570.29k |
People

17 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Shropshire
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 06 August 2004: Standard registration
- 11 January 2021: Funds received from 1123978 BRAVE BEN'S SUPERSTARS FUND
- EDWARD'S TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Hurley | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aine Gallagher | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dent | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bodkin | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony Barrett | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £662.88k | £704.01k | £602.08k | £591.32k | £638.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £523.71k | £480.59k | £590.22k | £702.18k | £671.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £28.89k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £646.13k | £693.05k | £598.33k | £588.14k | £632.17k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.64k | £0 | £321 | £849 | £143 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £13.43k | £10.96k | £1.82k | £360 | £840 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £680 | £0 | £0 | £1.18k | £5.34k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £1.61k | £794 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £41.00k | £0 | £15.26k | £48.70k | £7.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £415.42k | £396.90k | £495.19k | £605.88k | £570.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £108.28k | £83.69k | £95.03k | £96.30k | £100.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £69.68k | £63.62k | £0 | £159.70k | £87.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.80k | £2.27k | £3.84k | £2.86k | £578 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £514.27k | £735.88k | £751.78k | £621.56k | £664.16k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £33.69k | £31.34k | £36.96k | £16.63k | £89.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 23 DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 JULY 2004 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 24 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 OCT 2022 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
1.1.1 THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF THE EMOTIONAL, MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SUFFERING OF THOSE EXPERIENCING, OR PREPARING FOR, BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, A PARENT, SIGNIFICANT CARER, SIBLING, CHILD OR OTHER FAMILY MEMBER THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT OR OTHER ASSISTANCE; 1.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND PROMOTING AWARENESS OF ISSUES SURROUNDING BEREAVEMENT AND LOSS; 1.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR THOSE INVOLVED OR WORKING WITH THOSE SUFFERING BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS; 1.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF RESEARCH WITHIN THE FIELD OF BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS AND TO DISSEMINATE AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 1.1.5 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL ( WEST MIDLANDS)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Edwards Trust Ltd
37 Calthorpe Road
Edgbaston
BIRMINGHAM
B15 1TS
- Phone:
- 01214541705
- Email:
- admin@edwardstrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window