ST JOHN'S PLAYGROUP KINGSTON PARK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the development and education primarily under statutory school age and to encourage parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children. Provision of playgroup sessions four/five mornings a week. Encouraging other charitable activities. Providing educational opportunities for leaders and staff through training and personal development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
Total income includes £14,247 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 11 May 1998: Standard registration
- 30 April 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.74k | £43.98k | £38.33k | £32.45k | £33.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.03k | £42.05k | £38.04k | £37.55k | £50.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.97k | £29.10k | £21.36k | £14.25k | £14.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 06 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 06 June 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 31 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 31 May 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 18 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2016
(These accounts |
18 May 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT FOR PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN FROM THE AGE OF TWO AND A HALF WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT, THROUGH SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO AND ARE ENCOURAGED TO TAKE PART. THIS WILL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA SURROUNDING ST JOHN'S CHURCH, KINGSTON PARK, AND WILL BE SEEN AS A MINISTRY OF ST JOHN'S.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS FOR AREA OF BENEFIT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window