KINGSBRIDGE GYMNASTIC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide gymnastics coaching for children of all ages and abilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 20 May 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Louise Titterton | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dena Louise Stafford | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Littlejohns Rundle | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN MASTERS | Trustee | 21 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTINA EDMONDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.44k | £23.33k | £74.09k | £105.00k | £109.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.97k | £21.88k | £56.40k | £93.24k | £104.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | £250 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 March 2024 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 March 2024 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 FEBRUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, REGARDLESS OF ABILITY IN ALL FORMS OF GYMNASTICS AS REQUIRED BY THE BRITISH GYMNASTIC ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingsbridge Gym Club
Unit 7
Station Yard Industrial Estate
KINGSBRIDGE
Devon
TQ7 1ES
- Phone:
- 01548853216
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window