Accounts and annual returns RIBBLE VEHICLE PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1074702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 05 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window