RIBBLE VEHICLE PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation and restoration of historic buses, principally originating with Ribble Motor Services plus related artefacts. Non-commercial operation of the restored vehicles in support of heritage groups and transport gatherings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 March 1999: Standard registration
- R.V.P.T. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM LOUIS SMITH | Chair | 28 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Callum Joseph Louis Smith | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Martin | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
William Livesey | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Johnson | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Gardner | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terence Patrick Jobson | Trustee | 08 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Green | Trustee | 18 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lance David Jobson | Trustee | 26 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.03k | £72.18k | £96.79k | £57.73k | £63.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.99k | £64.31k | £76.69k | £72.86k | £59.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2024
(These accounts |
09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 FEB 2005.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC BY ESTABLISHING WITHIN THE FORMER OPERATING AREA OF RIBBLE MOTOR SERVICES LTD ONE OR MORE OPERATIONAL OR STATIC MUSEUMS OF TRANSPORT HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY COVERING ALL ASPECTS OF ROAD TRANSPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ribble Vehicle Preservation Trust
Naze Lane Industrial Estate
Naze Lane East
Freckleton
PRESTON
PR4 1US
- Phone:
- 07419190519
- Email:
- lance.jobson@rvpt.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window