THE RSPCA COMBINED INVESTMENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was established under a Charity Commission scheme on 4 November 1997 to permit the creation of a new Common Investment Fund, with the RSPCA as Trustee. No steps were taken to establish this fund in the financial year ending 31 December 2013.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
R S P C A | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS SEALED 4TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
A COMMON INVESTMENT FUND ESTABLISHED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF THE 4TH NOVEMBER 1997 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHARITIES AFFECTED BY THE SAID SCHEME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
R S P C A
Wilberforce Way
Southwater
Horsham
RH13 9RS
- Phone:
- 03001230410
- Email:
- executive@rspca.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window