Financial history KINGS MEADOW SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1068171
Charity reporting is overdue by 700 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A