KINGS MEADOW SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 17 February 1998: Standard registration
- HIGHFIELD SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Tanfield | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen McCormack | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 July 2021 | 370 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 5TH DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 17 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF KINGS MEADOW SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGS MEADOW SCHOOL
MANNING ROAD
MOULTON
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 7AR
- Phone:
- 01604673730
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window