ARAB WOMEN'S GROUP (LONDON) LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 June 1998: Standard registration
- 03 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £272.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH NOVEMBER 1996, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION INCORPORATED 16TH MARCH 1998, AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 1ST JUNE 1998.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING (INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF VARIOUS CRAFT PARTICULARLY HAND CRAFTS AND ANCILLARY SKILLS, LITERACY AND NUMERACY) OF WOMEN IN PARTICULAR OF ARABIC DESCENT. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF WOMEN OF ARABIC DESCENT AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF WOMEN OF ARABIC DESCENT WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WHO ARE INTENDING TO RESIDE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS IMMIGRATION, MONEY, DEBTS, WELFARE, BENEFITS, HEALTH, HOUSING, SOCIAL SECURITY, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window