BOWEL CANCER UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bowel Cancer UK aims to save lives and improve the quality of life for all those affected by bowel cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£7,067,007
Donations and legacies | £5.72m | |
Charitable activities | £1.74k | |
Other trading activities | £1.25m | |
Investments | £104.25k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,076,316
Raising funds | £2.15m | |
Charitable activities | £3.92m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.15m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.92m | |
Retained for future use | £990.69k |
People

82 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- THE BOWEL CANCER CHARITY (Working name)
- BOWEL CANCER CONCERN (Previous name)
- COLON CANCER CONCERN (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Damien Marmion | Chair | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Latham | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Kerr | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Husna Grimes | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alastair McKinlay | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Alison Hill | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Owen Watson | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Rudkin | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Butler | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wiles | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katharine Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr DIANA TAIT | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN FENWICK | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.82m | £4.59m | £5.31m | £6.26m | £7.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.78m | £4.10m | £3.54m | £4.78m | £6.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.57m | £2.14m | £2.08m | £4.63m | £5.72m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.23m | £2.07m | £3.22m | £1.61m | £1.25m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.00k | £135 | £2.34k | £10.57k | £1.74k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.71k | £6.35k | £2.84k | £9.25k | £104.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £377.81k | £6.89k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £60.57k | £731.36k | £272.62k | £326.45k | £490.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.03m | £2.86m | £2.18m | £2.99m | £3.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.75m | £1.24m | £1.36m | £1.79m | £2.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.88k | £11.16k | £11.20k | £17.70k | £12.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £357.25k | £0 | £481.10k | £225.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £199.47k | £101.60k | £34.19k | £66.92k | £164.75k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.27m | £2.83m | £4.35m | £6.09m | £7.13m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £683.21k | £647.87k | £745.97k | £1.04m | £1.19m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/12/2011 as amended on 18 Jun 2021 as amended on 21 Apr 2022 as amended on 15 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND /OR CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT, CURE AND EFFECTS OF BOWEL CANCER AND OTHER LOWER GASTROINTESTINAL CONDITIONS (TOGETHER “BOWEL CANCER”) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (B) TO PROVIDE SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND ADVICE TO PEOPLE AFFECTED BY BOWEL CANCER AND/OR TO THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES AND OTHER INTERESTED PERSONS; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROFESSIONALS ON THE ISSUES RELATING TO BOWEL CANCER; (D) TO PROMOTE AND INFLUENCE EFFECTIVE CARE AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY BOWEL CANCER AND THE INVOLVEMENT OF THEIR CARERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS IN THEIR SUPPORT; AND (E) THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 301
Edinburgh House
170 Kennington Lane
LONDON
SE11 5DP
- Phone:
- 02079401760
- Email:
- finance@bowelcanceruk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window