AGAPE IN ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. to relieve persons who are in conditions of need or hardship or who are aged or sick or homeless and relieve the distress caused thereby in such parts of the world as the trustees from time to time see fit. 2. to advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Charity's statement of beliefs in such parts of the world as the trustees may from time to time see fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 March 1998: Standard registration
- AGAPE IN ACTION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHANIE OATES | Trustee | 26 January 2009 |
|
|||||
MR M V OATES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.46k | £1.25k | £0 | £250 | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.57k | £1.81k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5 JANUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK OR WHO ARE HOMELESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT OF THOSE IN FINANCIAL AND ECONOMIC NEED IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT AND ADVICE AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO BECOME SELF SUPPORTING (D) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCATIONS WHERE THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE OPERATING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD STABLES
SHOLEBROKE
TOWCESTER
NN12 8TF
- Phone:
- 01327858777
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window