Accounts and annual returns WIRELESS PRESERVATION SOCIETY (NATIONAL WIRELESS MUSEUM)
Charity Number: 1070100
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 22 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 03 July 2008 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 03 July 2008 | 64 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 28 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 20 March 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 30 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | 30 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 22 November 2005 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | 22 November 2005 | 206 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window