Financial history ROTHWELL VICTORIA INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1068066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.93k £0 £0 £0 £5.95k
Total expenditure £4.85k £0 £0 £0 £2.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A