THE QUETZAL PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting women recovering from the trauma of childhood sexual abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 18 June 1998: Standard registration
- 19 July 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- QUETZAL (Working name)
- QUETZAL PROJECT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.00k | £94.76k | £39.72k | £27.14k | £44.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.00k | £80.19k | £55.23k | £42.20k | £31.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 21 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 23 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 05 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 20 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED 21 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE WOMEN IN LEICESTERSHIRE (LEICESTER CITY, LEICESTERSHIRE COUNTY AND RUTLAND) WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED SEXUAL ABUSE AND WHO ARE IN CIRCUMSTANCES OF NEED AND HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, WHEREBY SUCH PERSONS CAN SECURE BY COUNSELLING AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO: (A) PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH (B) ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING MENTAL DISTRESS
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE (LEICESTER CITY, LEICESTERSHIRE COUNTY AND RUTLAND)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window