4TH GREENFORD METHODIST SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Scouting Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ealing
Governance
- 21 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fletcher Miller | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jayne Hook | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Boorman | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Saunders | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey MIller | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Gordon Keith Wilson | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marian Patricia Wilson | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stanley miller | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Miller | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE BENNETT | Trustee | 23 May 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.38k | £9.36k | £4.21k | £4.57k | £2.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £1.30k | £1.47k | £6.04k | £5.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY ROYAL CHARTERS DATED 1949, 1959, 1967 AND 1991.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout HQ Rear of Methodist
Church Ruislip Road
GREENFORD
UB6 9QN
- Phone:
- 02088419651
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window