Trustees 4TH GREENFORD METHODIST SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1067595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fletcher Miller Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Nicola Jayne Hook Trustee 24 May 2024
None on record
Samantha Boorman Trustee 24 May 2024
None on record
Georgia Saunders Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Tracey MIller Trustee 23 May 2023
12TH NORTHOLT SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Gordon Keith Wilson Trustee 11 March 2020
None on record
Marian Patricia Wilson Trustee 11 March 2020
None on record
Stanley miller Trustee 19 May 2019
None on record
Thomas Miller Trustee 19 May 2019
None on record
LORRAINE BENNETT Trustee 23 May 2000
None on record