SHERBORNE COMMUNITY CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities. Christian worship services. Provision of community needs & resources. Youth & childrens social clubs. Holiday summer clubs. Caf?. Mums and Toddlers. Prayer and care services to and within the community. The Church is open to all a part of Sherborne Churches Together and a member of The Evangelical Alliance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Georgia
- South Africa
- Togo
Governance
- 12 March 1998: Standard registration
- 14 February 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 14 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1189540 REBORNE COMMUNITY CHURCH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.80k | £32.13k | £46.49k | £77.22k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.28k | £48.68k | £53.07k | £114.90k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 05 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 12 July 2019 | 12 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 OCTOBER 1997.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION. 3. THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR OR SICK OR DISABLED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window