FRIENDS OF PANGBOURNE PRIMARY SCHOOL (FOPPS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Pangbourne Primary School (FOPPS) is committed to organising fun events which improve community relations and provide sociable entertainment for parents and children and to raise much needed funds to benefit the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 26 January 1998: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF PANGBOURNE PRIMARY SCHOOL FOPPS (Previous name)
- PANGBOURNE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Howell | Chair | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Heath | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carrie-Anne Gadsby | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Greenwood | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MELISSA FRY | Trustee | 08 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.18k | £38.18k | £8.55k | £22.47k | £24.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.89k | £50.89k | £9.27k | £11.23k | £32.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 October 2020 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 October 2020 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/11/1995 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/2011 as amended on 25 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT THE PANGBOURNE PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LEA)
Area of benefit
PANGBOURNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
PANGBOURNE PRIMARY SCHOOL
KENNEDY DRIVE
PANGBOURNE
READING
RG8 7LB
- Phone:
- 0118 984 2315
- Email:
- info@fopps.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window