RAF UXBRIDGE STATION NURSERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 30 April 1998: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- RAF UXBRIDGE NURSERY (Working name)
- STATION CRECHE ROYAL AIR FORCE UXBRIDGE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2005 | 06 November 2006 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED 30/11/05
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A NURSERY FACILITY MAINLY FOR CHILDREN OF PERSONNEL EMPLOYED/PARENTED AT R.A.F UXBRIDGE BETWEEN THE AGES OF BIRTH AND 5 YEARS.
Area of benefit
R.A.F. UXBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window