Accounts and annual returns BETHEL TEMPLE OF CHRIST
Charity number: 1076102

Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 07 July 2024 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 07 July 2024 | 157 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window