Accounts and annual returns WHITLEY BAY PLAYHOUSE CO. LIMITED

Charity number: 1068116
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 24 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 14 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 15 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 01 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 01 December 2004 On Time