SOUTH YORKSHIRE ENGLISH SPRINGER SPANIEL RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To rescue and rehome stray, abused and unwanted English Springer Spaniels and to care for them until appropriate new homes are found.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 24 March 1998: Standard registration
- SPRINGER RESCUE (Working name)
- SYESSR (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR REG HINDE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andy Keeling | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER POINTER | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christina Hinde | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNE DEAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE GARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.04k | £55.87k | £54.05k | £58.88k | £62.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.31k | £63.82k | £44.05k | £52.90k | £42.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JANUARY 1998 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 8 FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF THE BREED OF DOG KNOWN AS ENGLISH SPRINGER SPANIEL WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT NEGLECT OR POOR CIRCUMSTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Resqued Charity Shop
9 High Street
Swallownest
SHEFFIELD
S26 4TT
- Phone:
- 01142877297
- Email:
- mail@syessr.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window