WAKEFIELD PRISON VISITS CHILDREN'S PLAY FACILITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide play opportunities for children and young people visiting HMP Wakefield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 26 January 1998: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.00k | £20.81k | £80.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.01k | £33.28k | £51.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 25 July 2008 | 55 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 31 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 31 May 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 23 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 23 May 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN VISITING WAKEFIELD PRISON OF ALL ABILITIES AND CULTURES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SAFE AND STIMULATING RECREATIONAL AND ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window